EP2810851 - Steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukagoshi, Masayuki c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14170757.0 | 02.06.2014 | [2014/50] | Priority number, date | JP20130117870 | 04.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013117870 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810851 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
B62D5/0448 (EP,US);
B62D5/0424 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lenksystem | [2014/50] | English: | Steering system | [2014/50] | French: | Système de direction | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE102006037479 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [A] 2,6 [I] 3,5; | [A]WO2011015374 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102008013128 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1920993 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [AD]JP2012224191 (JTEKT CORP) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2003343700 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2012224191 | JP2003343700 |