Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
13.07.2018 | Change - representative | |
21.06.2018 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.11.2017 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.06.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.01.2017 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
23.09.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.09.2016 | First examination report | |
08.06.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.06.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.05.2015 | Change - designated states | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
15.05.2015 | Change - request for examination | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
11.11.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
10.10.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
04.07.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |