Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2802143 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07115335 | 30.08.2007 | JP2006305711 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7958121 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2008114754 | 15.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006305711 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100915929B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2009 | B1 | KR20080042677 | 15.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006305711 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5027483B | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B2 | JP2008123210 | 29.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006305711 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1921860 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2012 | A3 | EP1921860 | 14.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2006305711 | 10.11.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP1921860 |