EP2843840 - Clock synchronizer for aligning remote devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verlinden, Jos NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
van de Beek, Remco Cornelis Herman NXP Semiconductors, Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2015/10] | Application number, filing date | 14176889.5 | 14.07.2014 | [2015/10] | Priority number, date | US201314015197 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: US201314015197 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2843840 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2843840 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/099, H03L7/14, H03L7/23 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H03L7/0992 (EP,US);
H04L7/0331 (US);
H03L7/087 (EP,US);
H03L7/14 (EP,US);
H03L7/23 (EP,US);
H03L7/235 (EP,US);
H04L7/0079 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Taktsynchronisiereinrichtung zum Ausrichten von Fernvorrichtungen | [2015/10] | English: | Clock synchronizer for aligning remote devices | [2015/10] | French: | Dispositif de synchronisation d'horloge pour aligner des dispositifs distants | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 30.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2014 | AL | 13.11.2019 | AT | 13.11.2019 | CY | 13.11.2019 | CZ | 13.11.2019 | DK | 13.11.2019 | EE | 13.11.2019 | ES | 13.11.2019 | FI | 13.11.2019 | HR | 13.11.2019 | IT | 13.11.2019 | LT | 13.11.2019 | LV | 13.11.2019 | MC | 13.11.2019 | MK | 13.11.2019 | MT | 13.11.2019 | NL | 13.11.2019 | PL | 13.11.2019 | RO | 13.11.2019 | RS | 13.11.2019 | SE | 13.11.2019 | SI | 13.11.2019 | SK | 13.11.2019 | SM | 13.11.2019 | TR | 13.11.2019 | BG | 13.02.2020 | NO | 13.02.2020 | GR | 14.02.2020 | IS | 13.03.2020 | PT | 13.03.2020 | GB | 14.07.2020 | IE | 14.07.2020 | LU | 14.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 14.07.2014 | |
AL | 13.11.2019 | ||
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CY | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
MT | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
TR | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.07.2020 | ||
IE | 14.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.07.2020 | ||
IE | 14.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
GB | 14.07.2020 | ||
LU | 14.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 14.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
MC | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
IT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
AT | 13.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SI | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
SK | 13.11.2019 | ||
SM | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
DK | 13.11.2019 | ||
EE | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
CZ | 13.11.2019 | ||
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RO | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 13.11.2019 | |
ES | 13.11.2019 | ||
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
HR | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
RS | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
IS | 13.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 13.11.2019 | |
FI | 13.11.2019 | ||
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
LV | 13.11.2019 | ||
NL | 13.11.2019 | ||
PL | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
GR | 14.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 13.11.2019 | |
LT | 13.11.2019 | ||
SE | 13.11.2019 | ||
BG | 13.02.2020 | ||
NO | 13.02.2020 | ||
PT | 13.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 13.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008094145 (KUAN CHI-KUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0020]; figures 2,3 *; | [XI]US2012013406 (ZHU DAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023]; figures 3,4 * [I] 7,8,12-14; | [XI] - URBANSKY R ET AL, "DESIGN ASPECTS AND ANALYSIS OF SDH EQUIPMENT CLOCKS", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS, WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (19960101), vol. 7, no. 1, ISSN 1124-318X, pages 39 - 48, XP000580347 [X] 1,3,5,6,9-11 *Section: 2. NETWORK SYNCHRONIZATION AND SLAVE CLOCK REQUIREMENTS* *Section: 3. SLAVE CLOCKS* [I] 7,8,12-14 |