EP2853178 - Foldable display, being foldable to a unit with an extra small surface area [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pozo Negro Beheer B.V. Maasdijk 3 6019 AB Wessem / NL | [2015/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hol, Johannes Leonardus Martinus Loperweg 8 6101 AE Echt / NL | [2015/14] | Representative(s) | Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Patentwerk B.V. Julianaplein 4 5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 14181399.8 | 19.08.2014 | [2015/14] | Priority number, date | NL20132011530 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: NL 2011530 | [2015/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2853178 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/11 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
A47F5/116 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Faltbare Display, faltbar zu einer Einheit mit einem extrem kleine Oberfläche | [2015/14] | English: | Foldable display, being foldable to a unit with an extra small surface area | [2015/14] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pliable, pouvant être plié à une unité avec une surface extrêmement petite | [2015/14] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 23.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US901858 (WILLIAMS CHARLES F [US]) [A] 1* figure 5 *; | [A]CH672238 (F A G ARTI GRAFICHE S R L) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2322357 (TRIO PACKING MATERIALS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2010006529 (GROFF ALAN M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |