|
09.03.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
07.12.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
29.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2016 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.07.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
14.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2015 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.02.2015 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |