EP2953343 - Method for sorting and homogenizing a group of images, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sabater, Neus c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | 02 /
Hellier, Pierre c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | 03 /
Demoulin, Vincent c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE 975 Avenue des Champs-Blancs CS17616 35576 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Huchet, Anne Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14305837.8 | 03.06.2014 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953343 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/62, G06F17/30 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H04N1/60 (EP);
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F16/5862 (US);
H04N1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sortieren und Homogenisieren einer Gruppe von Bildern, entsprechende Vorrichtung, Computerprogramm und übergangsloses computerlesbares Medium | [2015/50] | English: | Method for sorting and homogenizing a group of images, corresponding device, computer program and non-transitory computer-readable medium | [2015/50] | French: | Procédé de tri et d'homogénéisation d'un groupe d'images, dispositif correspondant, programme informatique et support lisible par ordinateur non transitoire | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5930783 (LI WEN-SYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1231777 (GRETAG IMAGING TRADING AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1640914 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC INF TECH [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2013016837 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y] - NEEL JOSHI ET AL, "Personal photo enhancement using example images", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (20100301), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1145/1731047.1731050, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 15, XP055152246 [Y] 1-15 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1731047.1731050 | [Y] - LYNDON KENNEDY ET AL, "How flickr helps us make sense of the world", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA , MULTIMEDIA '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070101), doi:10.1145/1291233.1291384, ISBN 978-1-59-593702-5, page 631, XP055152251 [Y] 1-15 * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1291233.1291384 | [A] - THOMAS DESELAERS ET AL, "Features for image retrieval: an experimental comparison", INFORMATION RETRIEVAL, (20071129), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s10791-007-9039-3, ISSN 1386-4564, pages 77 - 107, XP055151695 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10791-007-9039-3 | [A] - PIERRE-ALAIN MOËLLIC ET AL, "Image clustering based on a shared nearest neighbors approach for tagged collections", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2008 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONTENT-BASED IMAGE AND VIDEO RETRIEVAL, CIVR '08, New York, New York, USA, (20080101), doi:10.1145/1386352.1386390, ISBN 978-1-60-558070-8, page 269, XP055056653 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1386352.1386390 | by applicant | - Y. RUBNER, "The Earth Mover's Distance as a Metric for Image Retrieval", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION, (2000), vol. 40, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1023/a:1026543900054, pages 99 - 121, XP007910189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/a:1026543900054 | - S-H. CHA, "Taxonomy of Nominal Type Histogram Distance Measures", AMERICAN CONFERENCE ON APPLIED MATHEMATICS (MATH'08, (20080324), pages 325 - 330 | - B. GEORGESCU, "Mean Shift Based Clustering in High Dimensions: A Texture Classification Example", NINTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (20031013), vol. 1, page 456463 | - Y. CHENG, "Mean shift, mode seeking, and clustering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (199508), vol. 17, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/34.400568, pages 790 - 799, XP000527671 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.400568 | - Y. BOYKOV; V. KOLMOGOROV, "An Experimental Comparison of Min-Cut/Max-Flow Algorithms for Energy Minimization in Vision", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE (PAMI, (200409), vol. 26, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60, pages 1124 - 1137, XP011115612 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2004.60 | - E. REINHARD, "Color Transfer between Images", IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS, (200109), vol. 21, no. 5, XP002728545 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/38.946629 | - F. PITIE, "N-Dimensional Probability Density Function Transfer and its Application to Color Transfer", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, (2005), vol. 2, pages 1434 - 1439, XP002728546 |