25.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2022 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
07.04.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.01.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2019 |
First examination report |
|
06.08.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.01.2019 [2019/02] |
27.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.11.2016 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.11.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
11.11.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
03.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
18.11.2014 |
Change - representative |
|