EP3015872 - Threshold detection circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delta Electronics (Thailand) Public Co., Ltd. 909 Soi 9, Moo 4 Bangpoo Industrial Estate (E.P.Z.) Pattana 1 Road, Tampol Phraksa, Amphur Muang Samutprakarn 10280 / TH | [2019/02] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states DET International Holding Limited Scotia Center, 4th Floor George Town Grand Cayman / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krumpholz, Christian Im Wolfswinkel 28 79110 Freiburg / DE | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Stäbler, Roman, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | Application number, filing date | 14405077.0 | 30.10.2014 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015872 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/165, H02H3/24, // H03K5/1534 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
H02H3/207 (EP);
G01R19/16566 (EP);
H03K5/1534 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2016/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schwellwertdetektionsschaltung | [2016/18] | English: | Threshold detection circuit | [2016/18] | French: | Circuit de détection de seuil | [2016/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/50] | 09.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.06.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 15.06.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0284279 (EXAR CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,6,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - line 21 * * column 1, line 50 - line 53 * * column 3, line 32 - line 35 * * column 3, line 19 - line 51 * [A] 9,15,18 [I] 3,4,11; | [IA]US5019722 (HESS ROBERT M [US], et al) [I] 1-3,11,15,16,18,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line 65 * * column 2, line 23 - line 41 * * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 66 * [A] 4,5,7; | [A]US2008258709 (SHUEY KENNETH C [US]) [A] 1-3,9,11,14,15,18,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0026] , [0033] - [0039] * | by applicant | DE19748633 | JPH02292942 |