EP2978523 - GRANULAR MATERIAL FOR ABSORPTION OF HARMFUL GASES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fels-Werke GmbH Geheimrat-Ebert-Strasse 12 38640 Goslar / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2016/05] | For all designated states Fels-Werke GmbH Geheimrat-Ebert-Strasse 12 38640 Goslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOENKENDORF, Ulf Soltgrund 4 31188 Holle / DE | 02 /
STUMPF, Thomas Rudolf-Huch-Strasse 5A 38667 Bad Harzburg / DE | 03 /
HAASE, Christina Ernst-Thälmann-Str. 9a 38855 Nordharz / DE | 04 /
MEHLING, Christine Am Gönnenicht 18 38871 Abbenrode / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
BOENKENDORF, Ulf Soltgrund 4 31188 Holle / DE | ||
02 /
STUMPF, Thomas Rudolf-Huch-Strasse 5A 38667 Bad Harzburg / DE | |||
03 /
LANGE, Christina Heidebreite 13 38855 Wernigerode / DE | |||
04 /
MEHLING, Christine Am Gönnenicht 18 38871 Abbenrode / DE | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2016/05] | Solf, Annkathrin Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14714256.6 | 28.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014EP56321 | Priority number, date | DE20131005497 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013005497 | [2016/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014154876 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978523 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2978523 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/04, B01D53/02, B01J20/30, B01J20/28 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
B01J20/043 (EP,RU,US);
B01D53/02 (EP,RU,US);
B01D53/508 (US);
B01D53/685 (US);
B01J20/041 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/28004 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/28059 (EP,US);
B01J20/3028 (EP,RU,US);
B01J20/305 (EP,US);
B01J20/3064 (EP,US);
B01D2251/404 (EP,US);
B01D2251/604 (EP,US);
B01D2251/606 (EP,US);
B01D2253/30 (EP,US);
B01D2253/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2045 (EP,US);
B01D2257/2047 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | 20.10.2015 | ME | 20.10.2015 | Title | German: | GRANULAT ZUR ABSORPTION VON SCHADGASEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/05] | English: | GRANULAR MATERIAL FOR ABSORPTION OF HARMFUL GASES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2016/05] | French: | GRANULAT SERVANT À ABSORBER DES GAZ NOCIFS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DUDIT GRANULAT | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 03.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.2022
09.02.2022
ADMISSIBLE Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.02.2022
09.02.2022
ADMISSIBLE Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 23.02.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.06.2022 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 12.01.2024 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2014 | AL | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | AT | 28.03.2022 | LU | 28.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.03.2014 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
AT | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
AT | 28.03.2022 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 28.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | DK | 05.05.2021 | |
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | DK | 05.05.2021 | |
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | DK | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | ES | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | ES | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 05.05.2021 | |
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 05.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2011039034 (SCHLICHT TORSTEN [GB], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14-18,25 * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 36; table 1 * * claims 18, 19 * * abstract * [Y] 19-24; | [X]EP0748766 (RHEINISCHE KALKSTEINWERKE [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14-18,25 * column 3, line 11 - line 27 * * column 1, line 20 - line 22; claim 5 *; | [X]WO2013034314 (FELS WERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-18,25 * page 7 - page 10; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0487913 (WALHALLA KALK ENTWICKLUNGS UND [DE]) [Y] 19-24 * column 4, line 9 - line 20; claims 6,11 * | by applicant | DE102009045278 | DE102011112657 | DE102011113034 | Opposition | US2011002870 | US2002103074 | US2009130012 | US2012235086 | WO2013034314 | WO2013034315 | JP2009214027 | - S.-H. WEI et al., "High Surface Area Calcium Carbonate: Pore Structural Properties and Sulfation Characteristics", Ind. Eng. Chem. Res., (19970602), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 2141 - 2148, XP055895276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie960768l |