|
26.06.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.06.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2015 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
18.04.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |