Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10400431 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2019 | B2 | US2016024768 | 28.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105121754B | Global Dossier | 17.07.2018 | B | CN105121754 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2971384 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP2971384 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015022611 | 13.10.2021 | B1 | BR112015022611 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX367016 | 02.08.2019 | B | MX2015011921 | 01.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2621262 | 01.06.2017 | C2 | RU2015138449 | 17.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI24322 | 30.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI24477 | 31.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI24511 | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI24607 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI24608 | 31.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2971384T | 31.01.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | EP14719388 | 28.02.2014 | WO2014SI00012 | 28.02.2014 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014142766 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201815741T | 21.11.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | SI201300395 | 25.11.2013 | SI201300054 | 12.03.2013 | SI201300355 | 28.10.2013 | SI201300267 | 16.09.2013 | SI201300266 | 16.09.2013 |