17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
30.03.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
21.04.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.03.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.03.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.01.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
13.11.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
25.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
15.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
16.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
25.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|