Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10014792 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2018 | B2 | US2016322913 | 03.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP59652 | 12.05.2014 | CN201310706158 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3084947 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2019 | B1 | EP3084947 | 26.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP59652 | 12.05.2014 | CN201310706158 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015090629 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310706158 | 19.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104734528B | Global Dossier | 07.09.2018 | B | CN104734528 | 24.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310706158 | 19.12.2013 |