17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
10.11.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
02.12.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] |
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.11.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.11.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.09.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.07.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
29.07.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
01.07.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
23.05.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
29.01.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
25.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
17.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|