Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9809909 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2017107646 | 20.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615392257 | 28.12.2016 | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108048959B | Global Dossier | 27.10.2020 | B | CN108048959 | 18.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201480022573 | 24.04.2014 | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105143533B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2017 | B | CN105143533 | 09.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US35326 | 24.04.2014 | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2989242 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2017 | B1 | EP2989242 | 02.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US35326 | 24.04.2014 | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014176440 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9598795 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2017 | B2 | US2014319118 | 30.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2989242T | 17.03.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 | US201361816376 | 26.04.2013 |