EP2989242 - FIBER OXIDATION OVEN WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENTLY CONTROLLABLE HEATING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELGAARD, Hans L. c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14731846.3 | 24.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014US35326 | Priority number, date | US201361816376P | 26.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361816376 P | US201414257383 | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US201414257383 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014176440 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989242 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989242 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F27B3/04, F27B3/20, F27B3/22, F27B17/00, F27D99/00, F27D19/00, D02J13/00, D01F9/32, F27B3/28, F27D7/02, F27D17/00 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
D02J13/001 (EP,US);
D01F9/322 (US);
D01F9/32 (EP,US);
D01F9/324 (US);
D01F9/328 (US);
F27B17/00 (US);
F27B17/0025 (EP,US);
F27B17/0075 (EP,US);
F27B3/04 (EP,US);
F27B3/045 (EP,US);
F27B3/20 (EP,US);
F27B3/22 (EP,US);
F27B3/28 (EP,US);
F27D11/00 (EP,US);
F27D17/004 (EP,US);
F27D19/00 (EP,US);
F27D7/02 (EP,US);
F27D99/0001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | D02J13/00, D01F9/32, F26B13/00, F27B9/10, F27B9/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASEROXIDATIONSOFEN MIT MEHREREN UNABHÄNGIG STEUERBAREN HEIZUNGSANLAGEN | [2016/09] | English: | FIBER OXIDATION OVEN WITH MULTIPLE INDEPENDENTLY CONTROLLABLE HEATING SYSTEMS | [2016/09] | French: | FOUR D'OXYDATION DES FIBRES AYANT DE MULTIPLES SYSTÈMES DE CHAUFFAGE POUVANT ÊTRE COMMANDÉS DE FAÇON INDÉPENDANTE | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 04.01.2017 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | MT | 24.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US4515561 (MELGAARD HANS L [US]) [YD] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0848090 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]US5788484 (MELGAARD HANS L [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]JP2010002176 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2010100967 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XYI]CN201537998U (CHANGZHOU NEW LIAOYUAN MACHINERY CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7,10-13 * abstract * * figure . * [Y] 6 [I] 4,8,9,14,15; | [A]JP2010223471 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4515561 |