EP3017068 - PRIMERS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING HUMAN HEPATITIS C VIRUS (HCV) VARIANTS IN AN ISOLATED SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundació Hospital Universitari Vall d'Hebron - Institut de Recerca Passeig Vall d'Hebrón, 119-129 08035 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states CIBER (Centro de Investigación Biomédica en Red) Instituto de Salud Carlos III Pabellón 11. planta baja C/Monforte de Lemos 3-5 28029 Madrid / ES | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states Fundació Hospital Universitari Vall d'Hebron - Institut de Recerca Passeig Vall d'Hebrón, 119-129 08035 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states CIBER (Centro de Investigación Biomédica en Red) Instituto de Salud Carlos III Pabellón 11. planta baja C/Monforte de Lemos 3-5 28029 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Roche Diagnòstics S.L. Av. Generalitat, 171-173 08173 Sant Cugat Del Vallès / ES | |||
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Fundació Hospital Universitari Vall d'Hebron - Institut de Recerca Passeig Vall d'Hebrón, 119-129 08035 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states CIBER Centro de Investigación Biomédica en Red Instituto de Salud Carlos III Pabellón 11. planta baja C/Monforte de Lemos 3-5 28029 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Roche Diagnostics, S.L. Avda. Generalitat, 171-173 08174 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUER, Josep C/ Caballero 80 5º 1ª E-08029 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
RODRÍGUEZ, Francisco Travessera de Dalt 34 5º 4ª E-08024 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
GREGORI, Josep C/ Josep Calvó 11 E-08140 Caldes De Montbui / ES | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Merkel, Patrick Roche Diagnostics International AG Forrenstrasse 2 6343 Rotkreuz / CH | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/19] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14736385.7 | 04.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP64281 | Priority number, date | EP20130382278 | 05.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13382278 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001068 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017068 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017068 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/707 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRIMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG MENSCHLICHER HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS-VARIANTEN (HCV) IN EINER ISOLIERTEN PROBE | [2017/49] | English: | PRIMERS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING HUMAN HEPATITIS C VIRUS (HCV) VARIANTS IN AN ISOLATED SAMPLE | [2016/19] | French: | AMORCES ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION DE VARIANTES DE VIRUS HUMAIN DE L'HÉPATITE C (VHC) DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON ISOLÉ | [2017/49] |
Former [2016/19] | PRIMER UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG MENSCHLICHER HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS-VARIANTEN IN EINER ISOLIERTEN PROBE | ||
Former [2016/19] | AMORCES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DÉTECTER DES VARIANTS DU VIRUS DE L'HÉPATITE C (VHC) DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON ISOLÉ | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 18.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2014 | AL | 18.04.2018 | AT | 18.04.2018 | CY | 18.04.2018 | CZ | 18.04.2018 | DK | 18.04.2018 | EE | 18.04.2018 | FI | 18.04.2018 | HR | 18.04.2018 | IT | 18.04.2018 | LT | 18.04.2018 | LV | 18.04.2018 | MC | 18.04.2018 | MK | 18.04.2018 | NL | 18.04.2018 | PL | 18.04.2018 | RO | 18.04.2018 | RS | 18.04.2018 | SE | 18.04.2018 | SI | 18.04.2018 | SK | 18.04.2018 | SM | 18.04.2018 | TR | 18.04.2018 | IE | 04.07.2018 | LU | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | BG | 18.07.2018 | NO | 18.07.2018 | GR | 19.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | IS | 18.08.2018 | PT | 20.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.07.2014 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CY | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
MK | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.07.2014 | |
AL | 18.04.2018 | ||
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
TR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SI | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.07.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
MC | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
IT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
SM | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
AT | 18.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2018 | ||
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RO | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
SK | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
EE | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
DK | 18.04.2018 | ||
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
PT | 20.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
GR | 19.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
LV | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
RS | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
HR | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
PL | 18.04.2018 | ||
SE | 18.04.2018 | ||
BG | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
FI | 18.04.2018 | ||
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 18.04.2018 | |
LT | 18.04.2018 | ||
NL | 18.04.2018 | ||
NO | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 18.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [IY]WO03057915 (UNIV SOUTHAMPTON [GB], et al) [I] 1-4 * claims 1-17 * [Y] 5-13; | [IA]WO2008125119 (HVIDOVRE HOSPITAL [DK], et al) [I] 1-13 * table 1 * * claim 1 * * sequence 39 * [A] 14-16; | [Y]US2009325145 (SABLON ERWIN [BE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0063] - [0065] * * examples 3,7,9,11,15; claims 1-40 *; | [IY] - Y. TANAKA ET AL, "Inaugural Article: A comparison of the molecular clock of hepatitis C virus in the United States and Japan predicts that hepatocellular carcinoma incidence in the United States will increase over the next two decades", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20021126), vol. 99, no. 24, doi:10.1073/pnas.242608099, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 15584 - 15589, XP055084238 [I] 7-9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-8,10-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.242608099 | [IY] - PARK J C ET AL, "Development and clinical evaluation of a microarray for hepatitis C virus genotyping", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 163, no. 2, ISSN 0166-0934, (20100201), pages 269 - 275, (20091023), XP026824803 [I] 1-4 * the whole document * * page 270, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 272, column 1, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * [Y] 5-13 | [I] - SHEEHY P ET AL, "A strategy for obtaining near full-length HCV cDNA clones (assemblicons) by assembly PCR", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 123, no. 2, ISSN 0166-0934, (20050201), pages 115 - 124, (20050201), XP027667298 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * * table 2 * | [Y] - SUELI M NAKATANI ET AL, "Comparative performance evaluation of hepatitis C virus genotyping based on the 5' untranslated region versus partial sequencing of the NS5B region of brazilian patients with chronic hepatitis C", VIROLOGY JOURNAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20111003), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-422X-8-459, ISSN 1743-422X, page 459, XP021114023 [Y] 3-13 * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-422X-8-459 | [Y] - SANDRES-SAUNE K ET AL, "Determining hepatitis C genotype by analyzing the sequence of the NS5b region", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20030501), vol. 109, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0166-0934(03)00070-3, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 187 - 193, XP002425272 [Y] 5-13 * the whole document * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-0934(03)00070-3 | [Y] - ROSS ET AL, "Genotyping of hepatitis C virus isolates by a new line probe assay using sequence information from both the 5'untranslated and the core regions", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20070626), vol. 143, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JVIROMET.2007.03.006, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 153 - 160, XP022131411 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jviromet.2007.03.006 | [AD] - SIMMONDS PETER ET AL, "Consensus proposals for a unified system of nomenclature of hepatitis C virus genotypes", HEPATOLOGY, WILEY, USA, (20051001), vol. 42, no. 4, doi:10.1002/HEP.20819, ISSN 0270-9139, pages 962 - 973, XP002423614 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.20819 |