|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
12.11.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2016 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
13 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
08.09.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
08.09.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
15.05.2015 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
73 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
29.12.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.12.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.12.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.12.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.08.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
18 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
30.06.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |