Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10705783 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2017039022 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615297288 | 19.10.2016 | US201313925545 | 24.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105378624B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2019 | B | CN105378624 | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313925545 | 24.06.2013 | WO2014US41032 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3014408 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2019 | B1 | EP3014408 | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313925545 | 24.06.2013 | WO2014US41032 | 05.06.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014209563 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313925545 | 24.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9489114 | Global Dossier | 08.11.2016 | B2 | US2014380193 | 25.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313925545 | 24.06.2013 |