EP3014409 - INDICATING OUT-OF-VIEW AUGMENTED REALITY IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.09.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALTER, Thomas George c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SUGDEN, Ben c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
DEPTFORD, Daniel c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
CROCCO, Robert Jr. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
KEANE, Brian c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
MASSEY, Laura c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 07 /
KIPMAN, Alex c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 08 /
KINNEBREW, Peter Tobias c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 09 /
KAMUDA, Nicholas c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 10 /
QUARLES, Zachary c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 11 /
SCAVEZZE, Michael c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 12 /
HASTINGS, Ryan c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 13 /
BROWN, Cameron c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 14 /
AMBRUS, Tony c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 15 /
SCOTT, Jason c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 16 /
BEVIS, John c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 17 /
KIRSCHENBAUM, Jamie B. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 18 /
FAJT, Nicholas Gervase c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 19 /
KLUCHER, Michael c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 20 /
MARKOVIC, Relja c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 21 /
LATTA, Stephen c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 22 /
MCCULLOCH, Daniel c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 14740037.8 | 20.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014US43304 | Priority number, date | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 Original published format: US201313927056 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014209770 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014409 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,KR,US);
G06T19/006 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/0172 (KR,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/017 (KR,US);
G06F3/167 (EP,KR,US);
G06T13/20 (KR,US);
G02B2027/0178 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | ANZEIGE VON BILDERN AUSSERHALB DER SICHT IN DER ERWEITERTEN REALITÄT | [2016/18] | English: | INDICATING OUT-OF-VIEW AUGMENTED REALITY IMAGES | [2016/18] | French: | INDICATION QUE DES IMAGES À RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE SORTENT D'UN CHAMP DE VISION | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2018 | 25.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/07] | 05.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 17.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6023275 (HORVITZ ERIC J [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * column 6, line 37 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]JP2000149167 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 7,8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0043] , [0 44] , [0 74] *; | [XI] - TORBEN SCHINKE ET AL, "Visualization of off-screen objects in mobile augmented reality", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 12TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMAN COMPUTER INTERACTION WITH MOBILE DEVICES AND SERVICES, MOBILEHCI '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100907), doi:10.1145/1851600.1851655, ISBN 978-1-60-558835-3, pages 313 - 316, XP055139063 [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * abstract * * Sections 1-3, 4.2, 7;; figures 1,2 * [I] 5,7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1851600.1851655 | [A] - SEAN G. GUSTAFSON ET AL, "Comparing visualizations for tracking off-screen moving targets", CHI '07 EXTENDED ABSTRACTS ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS , CHI '07, New York, New York, USA, (20070428), doi:10.1145/1240866.1241014, ISBN 978-1-59-593642-4, pages 2399 - 2404, XP055139065 [A] 1-4,6 * page 2399 - page 2401 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1240866.1241014 | [A] - SEAN GUSTAFSON ET AL, "Wedge: Clutter-Free Visualization of Off-Screen Locations", PROCEEDING OF THE TWENTY-SIXTH ANNUAL CHI CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS , CHI '08, New York, New York, USA, (20080406), doi:10.1145/1357054.1357179, ISBN 978-1-60-558011-1, page 787, XP055134592 [A] 1-4,6 * page 787 - page 791 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1357054.1357179 | Examination | JP2006285833 | US2012313775 | US2013141360 |