|
04.01.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2018 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2017 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
96 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.09.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
17 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
14.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |