Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3014409
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
11.01.2019 |
Refusal of application |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
24.09.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
21.09.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
16.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
11.07.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
22.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.06.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2017 |
First examination report |
|
26.05.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
26.08.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
01.04.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] |
27.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
23.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|