Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9761057 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2017069143 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615357826 | 21.11.2016 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | US201514805762 | 22.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9501873 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2016 | B2 | US2015325054 | 12.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | US201514805762 | 22.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102562577B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | B1 | KR20220165840 | 15.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20227004295 | 20.06.2014 | WO2014US43304 | 20.06.2014 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102475873B | Global Dossier | 07.12.2022 | B1 | KR20220028131 | 08.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US43304 | 20.06.2014 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | KR20167002161 | 20.06.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102362268B | Global Dossier | 11.02.2022 | B1 | KR20160023888 | 03.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US43304 | 20.06.2014 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105378625 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US43304 | 20.06.2014 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3014409 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US43304 | 20.06.2014 | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014209770 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9129430 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2015 | B2 | US2014375683 | 25.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313927056 | 25.06.2013 |