Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014114298 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201370033 | 23.01.2013 | US201361755484 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9988442 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2015361165 | 17.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414762086 | 22.01.2014 | WO2014DK50011 | 22.01.2014 | DKPA201370033 | 23.01.2013 | US201361755484 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2948472 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | B1 | EP2948472 | 16.11.2016 | A4 | EP2948472 | 02.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014DK50011 | 22.01.2014 | DKPA201370033 | 23.01.2013 | US201361755484 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2898239 | 31.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014DK50011 | 22.01.2014 | DKPA201370033 | 23.01.2013 | US201361755484 | 23.01.2013 |