EP3024447 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR ORAL INSULIN ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING A TABLET CORE AND AN ANIONIC COPOLYMER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOVGAARD, Lars Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
REFSGAARD, Hanne Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
KJELDSEN, Thomas Børglum Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 04 /
MADSEN, Peter Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14746972.0 | 11.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014EP64927 | Priority number, date | EP20130177786 | 24.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177786 | EP20140164198 | 10.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14164198 | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015010927 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024447 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K31/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/2846 (US);
A61K38/28 (US);
A61K9/2013 (US);
A61K9/284 (EP,US);
A61K9/2886 (US);
A61P3/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ORALEN INSULINVERABREICHUNG MIT EINEM TABLETTENKERN UND EINER ANIONISCHEN COPOLYMERBESCHICHTUNG | [2016/22] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR ORAL INSULIN ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING A TABLET CORE AND AN ANIONIC COPOLYMER COATING | [2016/22] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE POUR ADMINISTRATION ORALE D'INSULINE COMPRENANT UN COEUR DE COMPRIMÉ ET UN ENROBAGE DE COPOLYMÈRE ANIONIQUE | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/29] | Request for further processing for: | 27.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2017 | Decision despatched | 02.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]CA2187741 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * example 12 * * example - * * claim - *; | [I]US2007087957 (KIDRON MIRIAM [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] - [0034] - [0039] - [0077] - [89. 098] - [0014] * * example -; claim - *; | [I]US2007238707 (LEONARD THOMAS W [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0040] , [0048] , [0091] , [0136] - [0144] *; | [I]WO2011084618 (NOD PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] , [0118] * * examples 9,10,15 * * claim - *; | [I]US2013058999 (FOEGER FLORIAN ANDERS [DK]) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0045] , [0069] * |