Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016051485 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014ES70072 | 03.02.2014 | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014213848 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014ES70072 | 03.02.2014 | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2955224 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | A4 | EP2955224 | 16.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014ES70072 | 03.02.2014 | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2913881 | 14.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014ES70072 | 03.02.2014 | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015010163 | 07.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014ES70072 | 03.02.2014 | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014122346 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES201330131 | 05.02.2013 |