EP2955224 - BIODEGRADABLE BIONANOPARTICLES FOR RELEASING THE GSE24-2 PEPTIDE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universidad Autónoma De Madrid (UAM) Ciudad Universitaria de Cantoblanco C/ Einstein 3 28049 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universidad Del País Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea (UPV/EHU) Otri - Barrio de Sarriena 48940 Leioa (Vizcaya) / ES | For all designated states Centro de Investigación Biomédica En Red de Enfermedades Raras Jaime Roig nº 11 46010 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | ||
For all designated states Universidad Autónoma De Madrid (UAM) Ciudad Universitaria de Cantoblanco C/ Einstein 3 28049 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universidad Del País Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea (UPV/EHU) Otri - Barrio de Sarriena 48940 Leioa (Vizcaya) / ES | |||
For all designated states Centro de Investigación Biomédica En Red de Enfermedades Raras Jaime Roig nº 11 46010 Valencia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERONA ABELLON, Rosario Instituto de Investigaciones Biomédicas Alberto Sols Calle Arturo Duperier 4 E-28029 Madrid / ES | 02 /
PEDRAZ MUÑOZ, Jose Luis Universidad del Pais Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea Barrio de Sarriena s/nº UPV Campus de Leioa E-48940 Leoia (Vizcaya) / ES | 03 /
HERNANDEZ MARTIN, Rosa Maria Universidad del Pais Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea Barrio de Sarriena s/nº UPV Campus de Leioa E-48940 Leoia (Vizcaya) / ES | 04 /
IGARTUA OLAECHEA, Manuela Universidad del Pais Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea Barrio de Sarriena s/nº UPV Campus de Leioa E-48940 Leoia (Vizcaya) / ES | 05 /
EGUSQUIAGUIRRE MARTIN, Susana Universidad del Pais Vasco/Euskal Herriko Unibertsitatea Barrio de Sarriena s/nº UPV Campus de Leioa E-48940 Leoia (Vizcaya) / ES | 06 /
MANGUAN GARCIA, Cristina Centro de Investigación Biomedica en Red de Enfermedades Raras (CIBERER) Jaime Roig nº 11 E-46010 Valencia / ES | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Pons Glorieta Rubén Darío 4 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Pons Ariño, Angel Pons Patentes y Marcas Internacional, S.L. Glorieta Rubén Dario 4 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 14749363.9 | 03.02.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014ES70072 | Priority number, date | ES20130030131 | 05.02.2013 Original published format: ES 201330131 | [2015/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122346 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2955224 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 14.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12, A61K38/17, B82Y5/00, A61P43/00 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/5153 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K9/5146 (EP,US);
A61K9/5161 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE BIONANOPARTIKEL ZUR FREISETZUNG DES GSE24-2-PEPTIDS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/51] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE BIONANOPARTICLES FOR RELEASING THE GSE24-2 PEPTIDE, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND USE OF SAME | [2015/51] | French: | BIONANOPARTICULES BIODÉGRADABLES POUR LA LIBÉRATION DU PEPTIDE GSE24-2, PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION ET UTILISATION | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2015 | Translation filed | 04.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 27.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 01.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.08.2018 | 28.02.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009142408 (LIN XIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-22 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0050] * | [Y] - ROSARIO MACHADO-PINILLA ET AL, "Defects instability and telomerase activity produced by themutation in dyskeratosis congenita are rescued by a peptide from the dyskerin TruB domain", CLINICAL AND TRANSLATIONAL ONCOLOGY, SPRINGER MILAN, MILAN, (20120724), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S12094-012-0865-4, ISSN 1699-3055, pages 755 - 763, XP035119913 [Y] 1-15 * page 757, line r - page 762, line r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12094-012-0865-4 | International search | [Y]ES2325431 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al); | [Y]ES2334736 (CONSEJO SUPERIOR INVESTIGACION [ES], et al); | [Y]US2009142408 (LIN XIN [US], et al) | by applicant | - CLIN TRANSL ONCOL., (201210), vol. 14, no. 10, pages 755 - 63 | ES20050002511 |