|
13.01.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
11.10.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
69 |
|
17.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Communication from Examining division including search results r.164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Search results under rule 164(2)(b) EPC |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Communication from the examining division with an Invitation to pay a search fee(s) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.03.2015 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
29.01.2015 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
38 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
28 |