EP3027734 - ISOLATED MICROORGANISM STRAIN LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioCC OÜ Kreutzwaldi 1 51014 Tartu / EE | [2017/47] |
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states Oü Tervisliku Piima Biotehnoloogiate Arenduskeskus Kreutzwaldi 1 51014 Tartu / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLT, Andres Sangla 25-8 EE-50407 Tartu / EE | 02 /
KALDMÄE, Helgi Kreutzwaldi 40-8 EE-51006 Tartu / EE | 03 /
KÄRT Olav Lõhe 28 EE-13516 Taééonn / EE | 04 /
OTS, Meelis Tammsaare 5-13 EE-51006 Tartu / EE | 05 /
SONGISEPP, Epp Tähe 105-7 EE-50107 Tartu / EE | 06 /
RÄTSEP, Merle Alasi 31-49 EE-50109 Tartu / EE | 07 /
KOKK, Kristiina Ringtee 31 Tõrvandi Ülenurme vald EE-61715 Tartumaa / EE | 08 /
STSEPETOVA, Jelena Moisavahe 2-8 EE-50606 Tartu / EE | 09 /
KÕLJALG, Siiri Elva tn 6 EE-50404 Tartu / EE | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Kahu, Sirje Patendibüroo Ustervall OÜ Kivi 21-6 51009 Tartu / EE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14752554.7 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014EE00003 | Priority number, date | EE20130000027 | 30.07.2013 Original published format: EE 201300027 | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015014372 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027734 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027734 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3027734 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, A23K30/18, A23K50/10, // C12R1/25 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
A23K50/10 (EP);
C12N1/20 (RU);
A23K10/10 (RU);
A23K30/18 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
C12R2001/25 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | C12N1/20, A23K30/15, C12R1/25 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM STAMM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2017/30] | English: | ISOLATED MICROORGANISM STRAIN LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 AND ITS USE | [2016/23] | French: | SOUCHE DE LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 ET SON UTILISATION | [2017/30] |
Former [2016/23] | ISOLIERTER MIKROORGANISMENSTAMM LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2016/23] | SOUCHE ISOLÉE DE MICRO-ORGANISME LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM TAK 59 NCIMB42150 ET SON UTILISATION | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2011159178 (INST BIOTECHNOLOGII PRZEMYSLU ROLNO SPOZYWCZEGO [PL], et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1386543 (MEDIPHARM AB [SE]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [ID]EP0580236 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I] - E. SAARISALO ET AL, "Screening and selection of lactic acid bacteria strains suitable for ensiling grass", JOURNAL OF APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (20070201), vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1111/j.1365-2672.2006.03103.x, ISSN 1364-5072, XP055146502 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2672.2006.03103.x | by applicant | EP0369198 | EP0580236 | EP0880323 | GB2356125 | EP2312955 | WO2010017568 | US6403084 | WO2006007395 | - MCDONALD, P.; HENDERSON, A. R.; HERON, S.J.E., The biochemistry of silage, CHALCOMBE PUBLICATIONS, page 340 | - "Biochemistry of Ensiling", ROOKE, J., A.; HATFIELD, G., D., Silage Science and Technology, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, MADISON, (2003), pages 95 - 139 | - "Ensiling of legumes", PAHLOW, G.; RAMMER, C.; SLOTTNER, D.; TUORI, M., Legumes Silages for Animal Production - LEGSIL. Braunschweig, (2002), pages 27 - 31 | - "Silage additives", KUNG, L.; STOKES, M. R.; LIN, C. J., Science and Technology, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF AGRONOMY, (2003), pages 305 - 360 | - HUTT P; SHCHEPETOVA J; LOIVUKENE K; KULLISAAR T; MIKELSAAR M, "Antagonistic activity of probiotic lactobacilli and bifidobacteria against entero- and uropathogens", J APPL MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 100, no. 6, pages 1324 - 32 | - VAN SOEST, P. J.; ROBERTSON, J. B.; LEWIS, B. A., "Methods for dietary fiber, neutral detergent fiber and nonstarch polysaccharides in relation to animal nutrition", J. DAIRY SCI., (1991), vol. 74, pages 3583 - 3597 |