EP2959092 - METHOD OF ENHANCING DRILLING FLUID PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, Philip, D. 13419 Piney View Lane Houston, TX 77044 / US | [2016/02] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
NGUYEN, Philip, D. 1107 Janes Avenue Duncan, OK 73533 / US | Representative(s) | Cottrill, Emily Elizabeth Helen A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14754602.2 | 12.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US16060 | Priority number, date | US201313773199 | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US201313773199 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014130323 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959092 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/38, C09K8/518, C09K8/94, E21B21/01, E21B21/08 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
E21B21/14 (EP,US);
C09K8/38 (EP,US);
C09K8/518 (EP,US);
C09K8/94 (EP,US);
E21B21/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | E21B21/01, E21B21/08, C09K8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER BOHRFLÜSSIGKEITSLEISTUNG | [2016/01] | English: | METHOD OF ENHANCING DRILLING FLUID PERFORMANCE | [2016/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR AMÉLIORER L'EFFICACITÉ D'UN FLUIDE DE FORAGE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 03.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 09.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003221831 (REDDY B RAGHAVA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2 - page 5; example -; claim - *; | [I]US2004110643 (ZEVALLOS MANUEL LEGENDRE [MX]) [I] 1-15 * page 2 - page 6; example -; claim - *; | [A]US2006157282 (TILTON FREDERICK T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]GB2432859 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2013029883 (DISMUKE KEITH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2 - page 4; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US4450010 (BURKHALTER JOHN F [US], et al); | [A]US6209646 (REDDY BAIREDDY R [US], et al); | [X]US2005126781 (REDDY B RAGHAVA [US], et al); | [A]US7642223 (SANTRA ASHOK K [US], et al); | [A]US2011048711 (LEWIS SAM [US], et al) |