06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
02.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] |
25.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
26.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
20.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
12.02.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
08.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.02.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.02.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.02.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
21.10.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
28.09.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
18.09.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.10.2020 [2020/43] |
04.09.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
18.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.04.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
17.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
10.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
10.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] |
03.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
03.04.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
27.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
27.03.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
11.10.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.11.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.11.2018 |
First examination report |
|
14.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
21.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
03.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
17.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
27.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|