Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016011198 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031440 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018167324 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | US201815891253 | 07.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017214504 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201715483943 | 10.04.2017 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016021678 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015063190 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10601715 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | B2 | US2019173794 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715791327 | 23.10.2017 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | US201916251030 | 17.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10554557 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2020 | B2 | US2016294530 | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | US201615183703 | 15.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10469387 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2019 | B2 | US2018048573 | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | US201715791300 | 23.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10218621 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2019 | B2 | US2018048574 | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715791327 | 23.10.2017 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20170032277 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160051806 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102236300B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2021 | B1 | KR20190076078 | 01.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102217802B | Global Dossier | 18.02.2021 | B1 | KR20160048145 | 03.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102031855B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180061408 | 07.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102009027B | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | B1 | KR20160048148 | 03.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52840 | 27.08.2014 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101986164B | Global Dossier | 05.06.2019 | B1 | KR20160048879 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52958 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101881482B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2018 | B1 | KR20160048875 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101864200B | Global Dossier | 04.06.2018 | B1 | KR20160048147 | 03.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101819622B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2018 | B1 | KR20160048878 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101743154B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2017 | B1 | KR20160048146 | 03.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017528033 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6195991B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2017 | B2 | JP2016535531 | 10.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6453335B | Global Dossier | 16.01.2019 | B2 | JP2016535530 | 10.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6434027B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B2 | JP2016535529 | 10.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016534643 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6469694B | Global Dossier | 13.02.2019 | B2 | JP2016534642 | 04.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52840 | 27.08.2014 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6441353B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2018 | B2 | JP2016533120 | 20.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6815866B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | B2 | JP2016532388 | 13.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016530823 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52958 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243783 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243782 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243781 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4429192 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP14771417 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | EP20216110 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3833149 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | EP14766837 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3823178 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2024 | B1 | EP3823178 | 19.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14771417 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3799342 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | C0 | EP3799342 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2023 | B1 | EP3799342 | 31.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | EP14771420 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3474622 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | EP14771421 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3220706 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | B1 | EP3220706 | 20.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP14771418 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3170351 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B1 | EP3170351 | 24.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039940 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP3039940 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039939 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B1 | EP3039939 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039935 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | B1 | EP3039935 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52958 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039934 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039933 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2019 | B1 | EP3039933 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039928 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2019 | B1 | EP3039928 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52840 | 27.08.2014 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039807 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2020 | B1 | EP3039807 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110380766B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2022 | B | CN110380766 | 25.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | CN201480047585 | 27.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106664704 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493611B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B | CN105493611 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493610B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2019 | B | CN105493610 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493607B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2019 | B | CN105493607 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52958 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493606B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2019 | B | CN105493606 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493605B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2019 | B | CN105493605 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493599B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2020 | B | CN105493599 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52840 | 27.08.2014 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493598B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2019 | B | CN105493598 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105493429B | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | B | CN105493429 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918853 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2020 | C | CA2918853 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918850 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | C | CA2918850 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918761 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | C | CA2918761 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918759 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2022 | C | CA2918759 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918755 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2019 | C | CA2918755 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015289632B | Global Dossier | 03.01.2019 | B2 | AU2015289632 | 05.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014311319B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2018 | B2 | AU2014311319 | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014311316B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2018 | B2 | AU2014311316 | 17.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014311308B | Global Dossier | 31.05.2018 | B2 | AU2014311308 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3039927 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | B1 | EP3039927 | 06.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016004195 | 14.03.2023 | B8 | BR112016004195 | 06.12.2022 | B1 | BR112016004195 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016004197 | 11.04.2023 | B1 | BR112016004197 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52845 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016004207 | 14.02.2023 | B8 | BR112016004207 | 24.01.2023 | B1 | BR112016004207 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016004208 | 17.10.2023 | B8 | BR112016004208 | 11.04.2023 | B1 | BR112016004208 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016004213 | 14.02.2023 | B8 | BR112016004213 | 31.01.2023 | B1 | BR112016004213 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017000209 | 31.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514799527 | 14.07.2015 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | WO2015US40645 | 15.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918760 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918847 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52840 | 27.08.2014 | US201462028250 | 23.07.2014 | US201462024989 | 15.07.2014 | US201414468942 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3039939T | 19.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3220706T | 07.10.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14771418 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2739601T | 03.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52958 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2745300T | 28.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52889 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2864288T | 13.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2865125T | 15.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2874874T | 05.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | WO2014US52884 | 27.08.2014 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1220822 | 12.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1220850 | 12.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1220851 | 12.05.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX354884 | 23.03.2018 | B | MX2016002554 | 17.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX354887 | 23.03.2018 | B | MX2016002557 | 17.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX355822 | 02.05.2018 | B | MX2016002558 | 17.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY181752 | 06.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ716882 | 28.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ717110 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ717393 | 29.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12016500172 | 25.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12016500196 | 02.05.2016 | B1 | PH12016500196 | 02.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12016500241 | 16.05.2016 | B1 | PH12016500241 | 16.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3039939T | 02.08.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP14771417 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2660606 | 06.07.2018 | C2 | RU2016106370 | 04.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2676878 | 11.01.2019 | C2 | RU2016106396 | 05.07.2018 | A3 | RU2016106396 | 03.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2663180 | 02.08.2018 | C2 | RU2016106398 | 03.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA516370610 | 01.04.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA516370611 | 05.05.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA516370612 | 07.04.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201600358Y | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201600361T | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201600374W | 30.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52844 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3039939T | 31.05.2021 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP14771417 | 27.08.2014 | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52825 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201601787 | 28.11.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | WO2014US52839 | 27.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031502 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031466 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031464 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031443 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031442 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031439 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015031431 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9860174 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2018 | B2 | US2015063320 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9699086 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2017 | B2 | US2015063291 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9923822 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2018 | B2 | US2015063258 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9467379 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2016 | B2 | US2015063257 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9800501 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2015063191 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10516614 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2015063111 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10212086 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2019 | B2 | US2015063318 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021090207 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6874052B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B2 | JP2019176494 | 10.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6874043B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2021 | B2 | JP2019146178 | 29.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6636603B | Global Dossier | 29.01.2020 | B2 | JP2019075795 | 16.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6625679B | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B2 | JP2018110414 | 12.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469400 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2016000374 | 25.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2016000401 | 25.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2016000411 | 25.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2748655T | 17.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2953194T | 08.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE045675T | 28.01.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469364 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE047026T | 28.04.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414468929 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE047112T | 28.04.2020 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE052741T | 28.05.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE053748T | 28.07.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469451 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE054252T | 30.08.2021 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469306 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY172359 | 21.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY176055 | 23.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469111 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3039939T | 04.03.2021 | T | Priority number | Date | US201361871269 | 28.08.2013 | US201414469175 | 26.08.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3833149 |