EP3050357 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SMALL CELL CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSA, Claudio Krebsen 14 DK-8900 Randers / DK | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Klaus Ingemann Blegkilde Alle 67 2. sal lejl 01 DK-9000 Aalborg / DK | 03 /
SEBIRE, Benoist Pierre 2-20-5 Kagurazaka Shinjuku Tokyo 162-0825 / JP | 04 /
WU, Chunli 12-5-301 Huihuayuan Huilongguan Changping District Beijing 102208 / CN | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Borgström, Markus Nokia Solutions and Networks GmbH & Co. KG T&I IPR Patent Administration St.-Martin-Straße 76 80240 München / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14776637.2 | 25.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014EP70497 | Priority number, date | US201361883559P | 27.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361883559 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015044272 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3050357 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30, H04W72/04, H04W74/08, H04W76/02, H04W36/00, // H04W36/36 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
H04W36/0016 (EP,US);
H04W36/0069 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W36/36 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KLEINZELLENWECHSEL | [2016/31] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SMALL CELL CHANGE | [2016/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE CHANGEMENT DE PETITES CELLULES | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP2603038 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [AP]EP2696624 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]); | [XP]WO2014117742 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]); |