|
27.01.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2016 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2016 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2016 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
14.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |