Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9981394 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2016229068 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP69821 | 17.09.2014 | DE202013104264 | 18.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105555490B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B | CN105555490 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP69821 | 17.09.2014 | DE202013104264 | 18.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3046735 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014EP69821 | 17.09.2014 | DE202013104264 | 18.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015040071 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202013104264 | 18.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202013104264U | 09.01.2015 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202013104264 | 18.09.2013 |