EP3046735 - WORKSTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Systems GmbH Blücherstraße 144 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAN, Robert Kurt Schuhmacherstrasse 7 86165 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
ZUNKE, Richard Stettenstrasse 30 86150 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
KLUMPP, Willi Ulrichstrasse 21/2 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 04 /
ZÜRN, Michael Wengertstrasse 23 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | 05 /
KÜHNEMANN, Ralf Hochleite 2 81545 München / DE | 06 /
HONSBERG, Otmar Flurstrasse 1 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 07 /
REICHENBACH, Matthias Gustav Mahlerstrasse 45 70193 Stuttgart / DE | 08 /
KLUMPP, Simon Novizenweg 6/1 73765 Neuhausen / DE | 09 /
DOMKE, Andreas Auwiesenstrasse 38 70565 Stuttgart / DE | 10 /
WIRTH, Konrad Schönblickstrasse 12 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | 11 /
EBERDT, Christian Fuchswaldstrasse 104 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 12 /
STRAUSS, Kurt Unterestrasse 12 72218 Wildberg / DE | 13 /
GÜRTLER, Alexander Stockholmerstrasse 2 15754 Heidesee / DE | 14 /
NEUREITER, Reinhard Baaderstrasse 29 80469 München / DE | 15 /
RAU, Thomas Dachsteinweg 6 86420 Diedorf / DE | 16 /
STOCKSCHLÄDER, Julian Auf dem Kreuz 29 86152 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | 01 /
HAMAN, Robert Kurt Schuhmacherstrasse 7 86165 Augsburg / DE | ||
02 /
ZUNKE, Richard Stettenstrasse 10 86150 Augsburg / DE | |||
03 /
KLUMPP, Willi Ulrichstrasse 21/2 73760 Ostfildern / DE | |||
04 /
ZÜRN, Michael Wengertstrasse 23 71065 Sindelfingen / DE | |||
05 /
KÜHNEMANN, Ralf Hochleite 2 81545 München / DE | |||
06 /
HONSBERG, Otmar Flurstrasse 1 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | |||
07 /
REICHENBACH, Matthias Gustav Mahlerstrasse 45 70193 Stuttgart / DE | |||
08 /
KLUMPP, Simon Novizenweg 6/1 73765 Neuhausen / DE | |||
09 /
DOMKE, Andreas Auwiesenstrasse 38 70565 Stuttgart / DE | |||
10 /
WIRTH, Konrad Schönblickstrasse 12 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | |||
11 /
EBERDT, Christian Fuchswaldstrasse 104 70569 Stuttgart / DE | |||
12 /
STRAUSS, Kurt Unterestrasse 12 72218 Wildberg / DE | |||
13 /
GÜRTLER, Alexander Stockholmerstrasse 2 15754 Heidesee / DE | |||
14 /
NEUREITER, Reinhard Baaderstrasse 29 80469 München / DE | |||
15 /
RAU, Thomas Dachsteinweg 6 86420 Diedorf / DE | |||
16 /
STOCKSCHLÄDER, Julian Böhmeweg 51 89075 Ulm / DE | Representative(s) | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan, et al ERNICKE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Beim Glaspalast 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Ernicke, Klaus Stefan Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke Schwibbogenplatz 2b 86153 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14781093.1 | 17.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014EP69821 | Priority number, date | DE201320104264U | 18.09.2013 Original published format: DE 202013104264 U | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015040071 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046735 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25J19/06, B25J9/16, F16P3/14 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
B25J19/06 (EP,US);
B25J9/1676 (EP,US);
F16P3/00 (EP,US);
F16P3/148 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40196 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40198 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | ARBEITSSTATION | [2016/30] | English: | WORKSTATION | [2016/30] | French: | STATION DE TRAVAIL | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 30.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2010191372 (NIHEI RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,9-13,18-20,22 * paragraphs [0044] , [0047] - [0049] - [0051] , [0055] , [0056] , [0073] * * figures 1,2A,2B,6 * [Y] 2-5,8,14-17,21 [I] 6; | [Y]WO2007085330 (ABB AB [SE], et al) [Y] 2,8,14-17,21 * page 12, lines 7-23 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]DE202012101121U (KUKA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraphs [0023] , [0048] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102007063099 | DE102007014023 | DE102007028758 | DE102007059481 | DE102005027522 |