Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102279028B | Global Dossier | 19.07.2021 | B1 | KR20160065898 | 09.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 | WO2014DE00413 | 14.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3049543 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B1 | EP3049543 | 03.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 | WO2014DE00413 | 14.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016006204 | 01.08.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 | WO2014DE00413 | 14.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2674178 | 05.12.2018 | C2 | RU2016115909 | 25.06.2018 | A3 | RU2016115909 | 26.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 | WO2014DE00413 | 14.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015043560 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102013016366 | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102013016366 | 25.09.2013 |