|
20.09.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2022 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2022 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2022 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
85 |
|
01.03.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
86 |
|
29.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.11.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2017 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.11.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.2015 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
113 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
89 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
107 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
115 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
94 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
102 |