24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
22.09.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
26.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
05.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
14.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
18.11.2022 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
14.10.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
12.10.2022 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
07.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.10.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.10.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
05.10.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.10.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
28.07.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.07.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
21.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
28.02.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.03.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.11.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
11.02.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.12.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.08.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.08.2018 |
First examination report |
|
30.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
30.06.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
27.06.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
18.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
18.11.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
15.07.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
12.07.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.02.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
12.02.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
07.12.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|