Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9721175 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2017 | B2 | US2014333414 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9760785 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2014333413 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11023754 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2021 | B2 | US2017357867 | 14.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201715670419 | 07.08.2017 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10628571 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | B2 | US2019163891 | 30.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | US201916262015 | 30.01.2019 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10303964 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201715630419 | 22.06.2017 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10235508 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2014333415 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4156601 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | WO2014US37106 | 07.05.2014 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | EP14794941 | 07.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2995040 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2022 | B1 | EP2995040 | 21.12.2016 | A4 | EP2995040 | 16.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | WO2014US37106 | 07.05.2014 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1221827 | 09.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | WO2014US37106 | 07.05.2014 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201509208R | 30.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | WO2014US37106 | 07.05.2014 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014182787 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | A3 | WO2014182787 | 13.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361860475 | 31.07.2013 | US201313972556 | 21.08.2013 | US201361820917 | 08.05.2013 | US201361844097 | 09.07.2013 | US201361823669 | 15.05.2013 | US201313940799 | 12.07.2013 | US201313908618 | 03.06.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP4156601 |