EP3001465 - LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. 1B-36, 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si, Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AN, Soon Ho 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Chang Suk 65-16, Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
YUN, Jun Ho 65-16, Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Chae Hon 65-16 Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si 425-851 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
LYU, Si Hoon 65-16 Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si 00000 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/29] | 01 /
AN, Soon Ho 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Chang Suk 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
03 /
YUN, Jun Ho 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Chae Hon 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
05 /
LYU, Si Hoon 65-16 Sandan-ro 163 beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si 00000 Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
AN, Soon Ho 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Chang Suk 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
03 /
YUN, Jun Ho 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Chae Hon 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | |||
05 /
LYU, Si Hoon 1B-36 65-16 Sandan-ro 163beon-gil Danwon-gu Ansan-si Gyeonggi-do 425-851 / KR | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/24] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/13] | Isarpatent Patentanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14801832.8 | 08.04.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014KR03032 | Priority number, date | KR20130057847 | 22.05.2013 Original published format: KR 20130057847 | [2016/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014189207 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001465 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3001465 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/32, H01L33/00, // H01L33/14 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H01L21/0254 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/325 (US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/007 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | H01L33/14, H01L21/205, H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/02] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2016/13] | French: | ELÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2016/13] |
Former [2016/13] | LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2015 | Translation filed | 23.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 27.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2014 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 08.04.2014 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 12.06.2019 | |
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008315212 (JIANG FENGYI [CN], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0055] - [0057] - [0060] - [0062] * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP2017900 (SEOUL OPTO DEVICE CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0029] - [0030] - [0037] - [0041] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2009065762 (LEE CHUNG HOON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] ** figure 6 *; | [Y]KR20100068107 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] - [0026] * * claims 1-15 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US6287947 (LUDOWISE MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]KR100838196B (SEOUL OPTO DEVICE CO LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20100068107 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2012107991 (HUANG CHIA-YEN [US], et al); | [A]JP2013012683 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | KR100838196B |