Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3027092 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP3027092 | 08.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014TR00297 | 31.07.2014 | TR201309437 | 02.08.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015016801 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2015 | A3 | WO2015016801 | 05.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | TR201309437 | 02.08.2013 |