22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
02.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2021 [2021/31] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
04.06.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
26.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
26.06.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
24.06.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.06.2020 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.06.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.03.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.02.2020 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
22.11.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2019 |
First examination report |
|
01.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.11.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
30.11.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.11.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.09.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
23.09.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] |
06.09.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
20.06.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.06.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|