Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022354394 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202217859427 | 07.07.2022 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201715481868 | 07.04.2017 | US201916522062 | 25.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021386335 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US202117458643 | 27.08.2021 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201916266385 | 04.02.2019 | US201715483404 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649059 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2015164389 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9603561 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2017 | B2 | US2015164388 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015164385 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649058 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2015164384 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9943256 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2015164383 | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11766195 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2021161439 | 03.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US202117175146 | 12.02.2021 | US201815903332 | 23.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11406295 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2022 | B2 | US2019343434 | 14.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201715481868 | 07.04.2017 | US201916522062 | 25.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11382538 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2022 | B2 | US2019357820 | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201916522376 | 25.07.2019 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201715481868 | 07.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11103164 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2021 | B2 | US2019167170 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201916266385 | 04.02.2019 | US201715483404 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10952651 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2021 | B2 | US2018184951 | 05.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201815903332 | 23.02.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10426385 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2017209080 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201715481868 | 07.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10258264 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | B2 | US2017209082 | 27.07.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201715483404 | 10.04.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10039479 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2018 | B2 | US2017150911 | 01.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | US201715428589 | 09.02.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102250989B | Global Dossier | 12.05.2021 | B1 | KR20160098487 | 18.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6339204B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2017500942 | 12.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3733065 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | B1 | EP3733065 | 04.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | EP14816501 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109984755 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | CN201480075582 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109984754 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | CN201480075582 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109984753B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2022 | B | CN109984753 | 09.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | CN201480075582 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106028932B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2019 | B | CN106028932 | 12.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2931955 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2021 | C | CA2931955 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019226130B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2021 | B2 | AU2019226130 | 26.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | AU2014367039 | 21.11.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | AU2019226130 | 02.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014367039B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2019 | B2 | AU2014367039 | 22.09.2016 | A2 | AU2014367039 | 16.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3082597 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2020 | B1 | EP3082597 | 26.10.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | WO2014US66794 | 21.11.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3111452 | 25.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | CA2931955 | 21.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015094576 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2015 | A3 | WO2015094576 | 25.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6717997B | Global Dossier | 08.07.2020 | B2 | JP2019115714 | 18.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6502552B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2019 | B2 | JP2018149327 | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414261043 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261011 | 24.04.2014 | US201414261077 | 24.04.2014 | US201414260948 | 24.04.2014 | US201361916632 | 16.12.2013 | US201414260755 | 24.04.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3733065 |