03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
09.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
31.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
27.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.04.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
30.03.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
10.11.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2017 |
Change - extension states |
published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] |
12.12.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
19.08.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.05.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
08.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|