Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160086364 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US65547 | 13.11.2014 | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6389256B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2018 | B2 | JP2017504859 | 09.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US65547 | 13.11.2014 | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105723684B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2019 | B | CN105723684 | 29.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US65547 | 13.11.2014 | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3069497 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP3069497 | 21.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US65547 | 13.11.2014 | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015073722 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10051068 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2018 | B2 | US2015134761 | 14.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414539076 | 12.11.2014 | US201361904355 | 14.11.2013 |