01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
12.07.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
08.07.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
19.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
13.04.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.04.2019 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
13.04.2019 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
11.01.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
30.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] |
28.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
02.11.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
20.10.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
06.07.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2018 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2018 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
16.01.2018 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
03.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
16.10.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.02.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
10.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
10.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
11.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
29.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.04.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
06.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|