01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
21.02.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
15.03.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
08.03.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.12.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
09.12.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] |
25.11.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
05.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
12.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
24.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
14.04.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|