Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9800334 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2017 | B2 | US2016197676 | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310430976 | 18.09.2013 | WO2014CN86345 | 12.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6212753B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2017 | B2 | JP2016538794 | 08.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310430976 | 18.09.2013 | WO2014CN86345 | 12.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3048747 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2019 | B1 | EP3048747 | 11.01.2017 | A4 | EP3048747 | 27.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310430976 | 18.09.2013 | WO2014CN86345 | 12.09.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015039581 | Global Dossier | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201310430976 | 18.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104467962B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2018 | B | CN104467962 | 25.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201310430976 | 18.09.2013 |